Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Schmidt, Werner | Canadian Alliance | Kelowna | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Scott, Mike | Canadian Alliance | Skeena | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Sekora, Lou | Liberal | Port Moody—Coquitlam—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, March 30, 1998 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Stinson, Darrel | Canadian Alliance | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Strahl, Hon. Chuck | Canadian Alliance | Fraser Valley | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.