Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lalonde, Francine | Bloc Québécois | Mercier | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Laurin, René | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lebel, Ghislain | Bloc Québécois | Chambly | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Loubier, Yvan | Bloc Québécois | Saint-Hyacinthe—Bagot | Quebec | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.