Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maloway, Jim | NDP | Elmwood—Transcona | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Mark, Inky | Conservative | Dauphin—Swan River—Marquette | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Wednesday, September 15, 2010 |
Martin, Pat | NDP | Winnipeg Centre | Manitoba | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.