Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thompson, Hon. Greg Francis | Conservative | New Brunswick Southwest | New Brunswick | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Thompson, Myron | Conservative | Wild Rose | Alberta | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Tilson, David | Conservative | Dufferin—Caledon | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Toews, Hon. Vic | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Trost, Brad | Conservative | Saskatoon—Humboldt | Saskatchewan | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Tweed, Merv | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.