Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paradis, Hon. Christian | Conservative | Mégantic—L'Érable | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Payne, LaVar | Conservative | Medicine Hat | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Petit, Daniel | Conservative | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Poilievre, Pierre | Conservative | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Prentice, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Calgary Centre-North | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, November 14, 2010 |
Preston, Joe | Conservative | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.