Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lake, Hon. Mike | Conservative | Edmonton—Mill Woods—Beaumont | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lebel, Hon. Denis | Conservative | Roberval—Lac-Saint-Jean | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lemieux, Pierre | Conservative | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lobb, Ben | Conservative | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lukiwski, Tom | Conservative | Regina—Lumsden—Lake Centre | Saskatchewan | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lunn, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Lunney, James | Conservative | Nanaimo—Alberni | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.