Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Galipeau, Royal | Conservative | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gill, Parm | Conservative | Brampton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Glover, Hon. Shelly | Conservative | Saint Boniface | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goguen, Robert | Conservative | Moncton—Riverview—Dieppe | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goldring, Peter | Conservative | Edmonton East | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goodyear, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gosal, Hon. Bal | Conservative | Bramalea—Gore—Malton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gourde, Jacques | Conservative | Lotbinière—Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Grewal, Nina | Conservative | Fleetwood—Port Kells | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.