Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Day, Hon. Stockwell | Conservative | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Devolin, Barry | Conservative | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Doyle, Hon. Norman E. | Conservative | St. John's East | Newfoundland and Labrador | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Duncan, Hon. John | Conservative | Vancouver Island North | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.