Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cannings, Richard | NDP | South Okanagan—West Kootenay | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Caron, Guy | NDP | Rimouski-Neigette—Témiscouata—Les Basques | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Choquette, François | NDP | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Cullen, Nathan | NDP | Skeena—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.