Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yelich, Hon. Lynne | Conservative | Blackstrap | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Young, Terence | Conservative | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Young, Wai | Conservative | Vancouver South | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Yurdiga, David | Conservative | Fort McMurray—Athabasca | Alberta | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.