Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wappel, Tom | Liberal | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Warawa, Mark | Conservative | Langley | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Wasylycia-Leis, Judy | NDP | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
White, Randy | Conservative | Abbotsford | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Williams, John G. | Conservative | Edmonton—St. Albert | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Wrzesnewskyj, Borys | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.