Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 20 of 20
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pacetti, Massimo | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Pallister, Brian | Conservative | Portage—Lisgar | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Paquette, Pierre A. | Bloc Québécois | Joliette | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Paradis, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Parrish, Carolyn | Independent | Mississauga—Erindale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Penson, Charlie | Conservative | Peace River | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Perron, Gilles-A. | Bloc Québécois | Rivière-des-Mille-Îles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Peterson, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Pettigrew, Hon. Pierre | Liberal | Papineau | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Phinney, Beth | Liberal | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Picard, Pauline | Bloc Québécois | Drummond | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Pickard, Hon. Jerry | Liberal | Chatham-Kent—Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bas-Richelieu—Nicolet—Bécancour | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Poilievre, Pierre | Conservative | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Poirier-Rivard, Denise | Bloc Québécois | Châteauguay—Saint-Constant | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Powers, Russ | Liberal | Ancaster—Dundas—Flamborough—Westdale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Prentice, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Calgary Centre-North | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Preston, Joe | Conservative | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.