Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 of 1
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lamoureux, Kevin | Liberal | Winnipeg North | Manitoba | Monday, November 29, 2010 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.