Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paradis, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Paul-Hus, Pierre | Conservative | Charlesbourg—Haute-Saint-Charles | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Peschisolido, Joe | Liberal | Steveston—Richmond East | British Columbia | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Peterson, Kyle | Liberal | Newmarket—Aurora | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Picard, Michel | Liberal | Montarville | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Plamondon, Louis | Bloc Québécois | Bécancour—Nicolet—Saurel | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Poilievre, Hon. Pierre | Conservative | Carleton | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Poissant, Jean-Claude | Liberal | La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.