Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Falk, Ted | Conservative | Provencher | Manitoba | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fantino, Hon. Julian | Conservative | Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fast, Hon. Ed | Conservative | Abbotsford | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Flaherty, Hon. Jim | Conservative | Whitby—Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Thursday, April 10, 2014 |
Fletcher, Hon. Steven | Conservative | Charleswood—St. James—Assiniboia | Manitoba | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Fortin, Jean-François | Haute-Gaspésie—La Mitis—Matane—Matapédia | Quebec | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.