Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yip, Jean | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, December 11, 2017 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Young, Kate | Liberal | London West | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.