Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Davidson, Patricia | Conservative | Sarnia—Lambton | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Davies, Libby | NDP | Vancouver East | British Columbia | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
DeBellefeuille, Claude | Bloc Québécois | Beauharnois—Salaberry | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Demers, Nicole | Bloc Québécois | Laval | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Deschamps, Johanne | Bloc Québécois | Laurentides—Labelle | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Dhalla, Ruby | Liberal | Brampton—Springdale | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Duncan, Hon. Kirsty | Liberal | Etobicoke North | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Duncan, Linda | NDP | Edmonton—Strathcona | Alberta | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.