Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Van Kesteren, Dave | Conservative | Chatham-Kent—Essex | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Van Loan, Hon. Peter | Conservative | York—Simcoe | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Vellacott, Maurice | Conservative | Saskatoon—Wanuskewin | Saskatchewan | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Verner, Hon. Josée | Conservative | Louis-Saint-Laurent | Quebec | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.