Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scheer, Andrew | Conservative | Regina—Qu'Appelle | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Schellenberger, Gary Ralph | Conservative | Perth—Wellington | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Schmidt, Werner | Conservative | Kelowna—Lake Country | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Skelton, Hon. Carol | Conservative | Saskatoon—Rosetown—Biggar | Saskatchewan | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Smith, Joy | Conservative | Kildonan—St. Paul | Manitoba | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Solberg, Hon. Monte | Conservative | Medicine Hat | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Sorenson, Kevin | Conservative | Crowfoot | Alberta | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Stinson, Darrel | Conservative | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Strahl, Hon. Chuck | Conservative | Chilliwack—Fraser Canyon | British Columbia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.