Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Leitch, Hon. K. Kellie | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Lobb, Ben | Conservative | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.