Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calkins, Blaine | Conservative | Red Deer—Lacombe | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Clarke, Alupa A. | Conservative | Beauport—Limoilou | Quebec | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Cooper, Michael | Conservative | St. Albert—Edmonton | Alberta | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.