Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dalphond-Guiral, Madeleine | Bloc Québécois | Laval Centre | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Desrochers, Odina | Bloc Québécois | Lotbinière—L'Érable | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Dubé, Antoine | Bloc Québécois | Lévis-et-Chutes-de-la-Chaudière | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Monday, March 17, 2003 |
Duceppe, Gilles | Bloc Québécois | Laurier—Sainte-Marie | Quebec | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.