Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 21 of 21
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bakopanos, Hon. Eleni | Liberal | Ahuntsic | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Boivin, Françoise | Liberal | Gatineau | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Coderre, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Bourassa | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Cotler, Hon. Irwin | Liberal | Mount Royal | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Dion, Hon. Stéphane | Liberal | Saint-Laurent—Cartierville | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Drouin, Hon. Claude | Liberal | Beauce | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Folco, Raymonde | Liberal | Laval—Les Îles | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Frulla, Hon. Liza | Liberal | Jeanne-Le Ber | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Jennings, Hon. Marlene | Liberal | Notre-Dame-de-Grâce—Lachine | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Lapierre, Hon. Jean C. | Liberal | Outremont | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Martin, Right Hon. Paul | Liberal | LaSalle—Émard | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Pacetti, Massimo | Liberal | Saint-Léonard—Saint-Michel | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Paradis, Hon. Denis | Liberal | Brome—Missisquoi | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Patry, Bernard | Liberal | Pierrefonds—Dollard | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Pettigrew, Hon. Pierre | Liberal | Papineau | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Proulx, Marcel | Liberal | Hull—Aylmer | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Rodriguez, Pablo | Liberal | Honoré-Mercier | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Saada, Hon. Jacques | Liberal | Brossard—La Prairie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Scarpaleggia, Francis | Liberal | Lac-Saint-Louis | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Smith, David | Liberal | Pontiac | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.