Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ratansi, Yasmin | Liberal | Don Valley East | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Redman, Hon. Karen | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Regan, Hon. Geoff | Liberal | Halifax West | Nova Scotia | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Robillard, Hon. Lucienne | Liberal | Westmount—Ville-Marie | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Rodriguez, Pablo | Liberal | Honoré-Mercier | Quebec | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Rota, Anthony | Liberal | Nipissing—Timiskaming | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Russell, Todd Norman | Liberal | Labrador | Newfoundland and Labrador | Tuesday, May 24, 2005 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.