HESA Committee Report
If you have any questions or comments regarding the accessibility of this publication, please contact us at accessible@parl.gc.ca.
APPENDIX B
|
Organizations and Individuals |
Date |
Meeting |
Department of Health Peter Brander, Acting Senior Director General, Regions and Programs Bureau |
2014/10/21 |
37 |
Hilary Geller, Assistant Deputy Minister, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
||
Suzy McDonald, Associate Director General, Controlled Substances and Tobacco Directorate, Healthy Environments and Consumer Safety Branch |
||
John Patrick Stewart, Executive Medical Director, Therapeutic Products Directorate, Health Products and Food Branch |
||
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health Dr. Peter Selby, Chief, Addictions Program |
2014/10/28 |
38 |
UK Centre for Tobacco and Alcohol Studies John Britton, Professor of Epidemiology, University of Nottingham, United Kingdom |
||
World Health Organization's Tobacco Free Initiative Dr. Armando Peruga, Program Manager |
||
Canadian Cancer Society Rob Cunningham, Senior Policy Analyst |
2014/10/30 |
39 |
Canadian Lung Association Margaret Bernhardt-Lowdon, Executive Director, Manitoba Lung Association |
||
Canadian Public Health Association Ian Culbert, Excutive Director |
||
Heart and Stroke Foundation of Canada Manuel Arango, Director, Health Policy |
||
As an individual David Hammond, Associate Professor, School of Public Health and Health Systems, University of Waterloo |
2014/11/04 |
40 |
Canadian Association of Poison Control Centres Dr. Martin Laliberté, President |
Canadian Pharmacists Association Glen Doucet, Vice-President, Advocacy and Public Affairs |
|
|
Barry Power, Pharmacist |
||
Vancouver General Hospital Dr. Milan Khara, Clinical Director, Smoking Cessation Clinic |
||
As an individual Dr. Gopal Bhatnagar, Cardiovascular Surgeon , Trillium Cardiovascular Associates |
2014/11/06 |
41 |
Dr. Gaston Ostiguy, Chest Physician, McGill University Health Centre, Montreal Chest Institute |
||
David Sweanor, Adjunct Professor, Faculty of Law, University of Ottawa, Special Lecturer, Epidemiology and Public Health, University of Nottingham, England |
||
180 Smoke Boris Giller, Co-Founder |
2014/11/27 |
43 |
Canadian Convenience Stores Association Alex Scholten, President |
||
Electronic Cigarette Trade Association of Canada Daniel David, Chair of the Board |
||
NJOY David M. Graham, Senior Vice-President, Global Regulatory Affairs |
||
Smoke NV Inc. Shanu Mohamedali, President |
||
Dr. Inderpreet Rai, Medical Director |
||
TVC Liquids Shawn Wells, Owner |
||
Consumer Health Products Canada Gerry Harrington, Director, Policy |
2014/12/02 |
44 |
Non-Smokers' Rights Association Melodie Tilson, Director of Policy |
||
Physicians for a Smoke-Free Canada Neil E. Collishaw, Research Director |
||
Quebec Coalition for Tobacco Control Dr. Geneviève Bois, Spokesperson |
||
Tobacco Harm Reduction Association of Canada Dave Jones, Director |
|
|
Government of New Brunswick Dr. Jennifer Russell, Acting Chief Medical Officer of Health, Department of Health |
2014/12/04 |
45 |
Government of Nova Scotia Dr. Robert Strang, Chief Public Health Officer, Department of Health Promotion and Wellness |
||
Toronto Public Health Dr. David McKeown, Medical Officer of Health |