Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 8 of 8
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caesar-Chavannes, Celina | Independent | Whitby | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Chagger, Hon. Bardish | Liberal | Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Chan, Arnold | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Thursday, September 14, 2017 |
Chen, Shaun | Liberal | Scarborough North | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Independent | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.