Members of the 42nd Parliament
(Thursday, December 3, 2015 to Wednesday, September 11, 2019)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Albrecht, Harold | Conservative | Kitchener—Conestoga | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Alghabra, Omar | Liberal | Mississauga Centre | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Alleslev, Leona | Conservative | Aurora—Oak Ridges—Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Allison, Dean | Conservative | Niagara West | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Anandasangaree, Gary | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge Park | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Angus, Charlie | NDP | Timmins—James Bay | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Arya, Chandra | Liberal | Nepean | Ontario | Monday, October 19, 2015 | Sunday, October 20, 2019 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.