Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 6 of 6
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Galipeau, Royal | Conservative | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gill, Parm | Conservative | Brampton—Springdale | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Goodyear, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gosal, Hon. Bal | Conservative | Bramalea—Gore—Malton | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Gravelle, Claude | NDP | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.