Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calandra, Paul | Conservative | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Carmichael, John | Conservative | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cash, Andrew | NDP | Davenport | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chan, Arnold | Liberal | Scarborough—Agincourt | Ontario | Monday, June 30, 2014 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chisu, Corneliu | Conservative | Pickering—Scarborough East | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Conservative | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.