Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
May, Elizabeth | Green Party | Saanich—Gulf Islands | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mayes, Colin | Conservative | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Westwood—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Murray, Joyce | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.