Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calandra, Paul | Conservative | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Cannis, John | Liberal | Scarborough Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Conservative | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Crombie, Bonnie | Liberal | Mississauga—Streetsville | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.