Members of the 40th Parliament
(Tuesday, November 18, 2008 to Saturday, March 26, 2011)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bains, Hon. Navdeep | Liberal | Mississauga—Brampton South | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Baird, Hon. John | Conservative | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Bevilacqua, Hon. Maurizio | Liberal | Vaughan | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Thursday, September 2, 2010 |
Braid, Peter | Conservative | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brown, Lois | Conservative | Newmarket—Aurora | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Brown, Patrick | Conservative | Barrie | Ontario | Tuesday, October 14, 2008 | Sunday, May 1, 2011 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.