Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wallace, Mike | Conservative | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wappel, Tom | Liberal | Scarborough Southwest | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Watson, Jeff | Conservative | Essex | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wilfert, Hon. Bryon | Liberal | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Wrzesnewskyj, Borys | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.