Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauzon, Guy | Conservative | Stormont—Dundas—South Glengarry | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Lemieux, Pierre | Conservative | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.