Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Galipeau, Royal | Conservative | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Gallant, Cheryl | Conservative | Renfrew—Nipissing—Pembroke | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Godfrey, Hon. John | Liberal | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Friday, August 1, 2008 |
Goodyear, Hon. Gary | Conservative | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Graham, Hon. Bill | Liberal | Toronto Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, July 2, 2007 |
Guarnieri, Hon. Albina | Liberal | Mississauga East—Cooksville | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Guergis, Hon. Helena | Conservative | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.