Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bains, Hon. Navdeep | Liberal | Mississauga—Brampton South | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Baird, Hon. John | Conservative | Ottawa West—Nepean | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Barnes, Hon. Sue | Liberal | London West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Beaumier, Colleen | Liberal | Brampton West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bevilacqua, Hon. Maurizio | Liberal | Vaughan | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Bonin, Raymond | Liberal | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Boshcoff, Ken | Liberal | Thunder Bay—Rainy River | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brown, Bonnie | Liberal | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brown, Gordon | Conservative | Leeds—Grenville | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Brown, Patrick | Conservative | Barrie | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.