Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 5 of 5
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Telegdi, Hon. Andrew | Liberal | Kitchener—Waterloo | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Temelkovski, Lui | Liberal | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Tilson, David | Conservative | Dufferin—Caledon | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Tonks, Alan | Liberal | York South—Weston | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Torsney, Hon. Paddy | Liberal | Burlington | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.