Members of the 38th Parliament
(Monday, October 4, 2004 to Tuesday, November 29, 2005)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Parrish, Carolyn | Independent | Mississauga—Erindale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Peterson, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Phinney, Beth | Liberal | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Pickard, Hon. Jerry | Liberal | Chatham-Kent—Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Poilievre, Pierre | Conservative | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Powers, Russ | Liberal | Ancaster—Dundas—Flamborough—Westdale | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Preston, Joe | Conservative | Elgin—Middlesex—London | Ontario | Monday, June 28, 2004 | Sunday, January 22, 2006 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.