Members of the 37th Parliament
(Monday, January 29, 2001 to Sunday, May 23, 2004)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Schellenberger, Gary Ralph | Conservative | Perth—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, May 12, 2003 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Serré, Benoît | Liberal | Timiskaming—Cochrane | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Sgro, Hon. Judy A. | Liberal | York West | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Shepherd, Alex | Liberal | Durham | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Speller, Hon. Bob | Liberal | Haldimand—Norfolk—Brant | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
St. Denis, Brent | Liberal | Algoma—Manitoulin | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Steckle, Paul | Liberal | Huron—Bruce | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Stewart, Hon. Jane | Liberal | Brant | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Szabo, Paul | Liberal | Mississauga South | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.