Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 9 of 9
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Parent, Hon. Gilbert | Liberal | Niagara Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Parrish, Carolyn | Liberal | Mississauga Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Peric, Janko | Liberal | Cambridge | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Peterson, Hon. Jim | Liberal | Willowdale | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Phinney, Beth | Liberal | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pickard, Hon. Jerry | Liberal | Chatham—Kent Essex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pillitteri, Gary | Liberal | Niagara Falls | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Pratt, Hon. David | Liberal | Nepean—Carleton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Provenzano, Carmen | Liberal | Sault Ste. Marie | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.