Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lastewka, Hon. Walt | Liberal | St. Catharines | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Lee, Derek | Liberal | Scarborough—Rouge River | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Limoges, Rick | Liberal | Windsor—St. Clair | Ontario | Monday, April 12, 1999 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Longfield, Hon. Judi | Liberal | Whitby—Ajax | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.