Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 13 of 13
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barnes, Hon. Sue | Liberal | London West | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Beaumier, Colleen | Liberal | Brampton West—Mississauga | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bélair, Réginald | Liberal | Timmins—James Bay | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bélanger, Hon. Mauril | Liberal | Ottawa—Vanier | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bellemare, Eugène | Liberal | Ottawa—Orléans | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bennett, Hon. Carolyn | Liberal | St. Paul's | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bevilacqua, Maurizio | Liberal | Vaughan—King—Aurora | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bonin, Raymond | Liberal | Nickel Belt | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bonwick, Hon. Paul | Liberal | Simcoe—Grey | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Boudria, Hon. Don | Liberal | Glengarry—Prescott—Russell | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Brown, Bonnie | Liberal | Oakville | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bryden, John | Liberal | Ancaster—Dundas—Flamborough—Aldershot | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Bulte, Hon. Sarmite | Liberal | Parkdale—High Park | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.