Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harris, Richard M. | Canadian Alliance | Prince George—Bulkley Valley | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Hart, Jim | Canadian Alliance | Okanagan—Coquihalla | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Wednesday, July 19, 2000 |
Hayes, Sharon | Reform | Port Moody—Coquitlam—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Wednesday, October 1, 1997 |
Hill, Hon. Jay | Canadian Alliance | Prince George—Peace River | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.