Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 7 of 7
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anderson, Hon. David A. | Liberal | Victoria | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Chan, Hon. Raymond | Liberal | Richmond | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Dhaliwal, Hon. Herb | Liberal | Vancouver South—Burnaby | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Fry, Hon. Hedy | Liberal | Vancouver Centre | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Leung, Sophia | Liberal | Vancouver Kingsway | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
McWhinney, Ted | Liberal | Vancouver Quadra | British Columbia | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Sekora, Lou | Liberal | Port Moody—Coquitlam—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, March 30, 1998 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.