Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
MacKay, Hon. Peter Gordon | Conservative | Central Nova | Nova Scotia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
MacKenzie, Dave | Conservative | Oxford | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Maguire, Larry | Conservative | Brandon—Souris | Manitoba | Monday, November 25, 2013 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Mayes, Colin | Conservative | Okanagan—Shuswap | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McColeman, Phil | Conservative | Brant | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
McLeod, Cathy | Conservative | Kamloops—Thompson—Cariboo | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Menegakis, Costas | Conservative | Richmond Hill | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Menzies, Hon. Ted | Conservative | Macleod | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Saturday, November 9, 2013 |
Merrifield, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Yellowhead | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Wednesday, September 17, 2014 |
Miller, Larry | Conservative | Bruce—Grey—Owen Sound | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Hon. James | Conservative | Port Moody—Westwood—Port Coquitlam | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Moore, Hon. Rob | Conservative | Fundy Royal | New Brunswick | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.