Members of the 41st Parliament
(Thursday, June 2, 2011 to Sunday, August 2, 2015)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 10 of 10
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Calandra, Paul | Conservative | Oak Ridges—Markham | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Calkins, Blaine | Conservative | Wetaskiwin | Alberta | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Cannan, Hon. Ron | Conservative | Kelowna—Lake Country | British Columbia | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Carmichael, John | Conservative | Don Valley West | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Carrie, Colin | Conservative | Oshawa | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chisu, Corneliu | Conservative | Pickering—Scarborough East | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Chong, Hon. Michael D. | Conservative | Wellington—Halton Hills | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Clarke, Rob | Conservative | Desnethé—Missinippi—Churchill River | Saskatchewan | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Clement, Hon. Tony | Conservative | Parry Sound—Muskoka | Ontario | Monday, May 2, 2011 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Crockatt, Joan | Conservative | Calgary Centre | Alberta | Monday, November 26, 2012 | Sunday, October 18, 2015 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.