Members of the 36th Parliament
(Monday, September 22, 1997 to Sunday, October 22, 2000)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 4 of 4
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Redman, Hon. Karen | Liberal | Kitchener Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Reed, Julian | Liberal | Halton | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Richardson, John | Liberal | Perth—Middlesex | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Rock, Hon. Allan | Liberal | Etobicoke Centre | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.