Members of the 39th Parliament
(Monday, April 3, 2006 to Sunday, September 7, 2008)
Refine your search
Results 1 - 12 of 12
Name | Political Affiliation | Constituency | Province | From | To |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angus, Charlie | NDP | Timmins—James Bay | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Charlton, Chris | NDP | Hamilton Mountain | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Chow, Olivia | NDP | Trinity—Spadina | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Christopherson, David | NDP | Hamilton Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Comartin, Joe | NDP | Windsor—Tecumseh | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Dewar, Paul | NDP | Ottawa Centre | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Layton, Hon. Jack | NDP | Toronto—Danforth | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Marston, Wayne | NDP | Hamilton East—Stoney Creek | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Martin, Tony | NDP | Sault Ste. Marie | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Masse, Brian | NDP | Windsor West | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Mathyssen, Irene | NDP | London—Fanshawe | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Nash, Peggy | NDP | Parkdale—High Park | Ontario | Monday, January 23, 2006 | Monday, October 13, 2008 |
Information about members of Parliament prior to September 1997 is available on the
Library of Parliament website.