Roles - John O'Reilly
Current and Past
Member of Parliament
Constituency | Province / Territory | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
Haliburton—Victoria—Brock | Ontario | Monday, November 27, 2000 | Sunday, June 27, 2004 |
Haliburton—Victoria—Brock | Ontario | Monday, June 2, 1997 | Sunday, November 26, 2000 |
Offices and Roles as a Parliamentarian
Parliament | Office or Role | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
37th | Parliamentary Secretary to the Minister of National Defence | Friday, December 22, 2000 | Sunday, January 12, 2003 |
Committees
Parliament ‑ Session | Role | Committee | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|---|
37-3 | Member | Subcommittee on Veterans Affairs of the Standing Committee on National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Thursday, February 26, 2004 | Sunday, May 23, 2004 |
37-3 | Member | Agriculture and Agri-Food | Wednesday, February 11, 2004 | Sunday, May 23, 2004 |
37-3 | Member | National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Wednesday, February 11, 2004 | Sunday, May 23, 2004 |
37-2 | Member | Citizenship and Immigration | Thursday, September 25, 2003 | Wednesday, November 12, 2003 |
37-2 | Member | Citizenship and Immigration | Wednesday, January 29, 2003 | Thursday, September 25, 2003 |
37-2 | Member | Legislative Committee on Bill C-17, Public Safety Act | Thursday, November 21, 2002 | Wednesday, May 7, 2003 |
37-2 | Member | Agriculture and Agri-Food | Wednesday, January 29, 2003 | Wednesday, February 5, 2003 |
37-2 | Member | Subcommittee on Agenda and Procedure of the Standing Committee on National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Thursday, November 14, 2002 | Wednesday, January 29, 2003 |
37-2 | Member | National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Thursday, October 24, 2002 | Wednesday, January 29, 2003 |
37-1 | Member | Subcommittee on Agenda and Procedure of the Standing Committee on National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Friday, October 12, 2001 | Monday, September 16, 2002 |
37-1 | Member | National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Friday, September 28, 2001 | Monday, September 16, 2002 |
37-1 | Member | Subcommittee on Agenda and Procedure of the Standing Committee on National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Wednesday, February 28, 2001 | Thursday, September 27, 2001 |
37-1 | Member | National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Thursday, February 15, 2001 | Thursday, September 27, 2001 |
36-2 | Chair | Aboriginal Affairs and Northern Development | Thursday, October 5, 2000 | Sunday, October 22, 2000 |
36-2 | Member | National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Tuesday, October 19, 1999 | Wednesday, September 27, 2000 |
36-1 | Member | Human Resources Development and Status of Persons with Disabilities | Thursday, October 1, 1998 | Saturday, September 18, 1999 |
36-1 | Member | National Defence and Veterans Affairs | Tuesday, September 30, 1997 | Saturday, September 18, 1999 |
36-1 | Member | Human Resources Development and Status of Persons with Disabilities | Thursday, October 1, 1998 | Wednesday, October 7, 1998 |
Election Candidate
Date | Election Type | Constituency | Province / Territory | Result |
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, June 28, 2004 | General Election | Haliburton—Kawartha Lakes—Brock | Ontario | Defeated |
Monday, November 27, 2000 | General Election | Haliburton—Victoria—Brock | Ontario | Re-Elected |
Monday, June 2, 1997 | General Election | Haliburton—Victoria—Brock | Ontario | Re-Elected |