The Chair presented the Fifth Report from the Subcommittee on Agenda and Procedure which reads as follows:
It was agreed — That pursuant to Committee agreement on scheduling witnesses in the following order, by category of importance, in relation to the study of Chapters 3, 4 and 5 of the November 2003 Report of the Auditor General regarding the Sponsorship Matter, the Standing Comittee on Public Accounts call and schedule the following persons to appear before the Committee in the following order; if desired witnesses cannot be scheduled in order of importance, a further category of expert witnesses be used to draw on to replace those witnesses:
HEADS OF CROWN CORPORATIONS INVOLVED:
Canada Post
Chairman
1995-1996 Peter Cameron
1996-1999 André Ouellet
2000-2005 Vivian Albo
President
1993-1998 Georges Clermont
1999-2006 André Ouellet
Chief Financial Officer
Via Rail
Chairman
1993-2001 Marc LeFrançois
2001-2004 Jean Pelletier
President and CEO
1993-1998 Terry Ivany
1998-2000 Roderick Morrison
2000-2004 Marc LeFrançois
Chief Financial Officer
Chief Strategy Officer
Ms. Christina Sirsly
Royal Canadian Mint
Chairman
1996-1999 Jose Blanco
1999-2005 Emmanuel Triassi
Master of the Mint
1996-2002 Daniele Wetherup
2002-2003 Emmanuel Triassi
2003-2008 David Dingwall
Chief Financial Officer
Business Development Bank
Chairman
1994-1997 Patrick Lavelle
1998-2000 Michel Vennat
2001-2007 Ced Ritchie
President
1993-1999 François Beaudoin
1999-2000 Bernd Schroder
2001-2004 Michel Vennat
Canada Lands
Chairman
1995 to 2001 Mr. Jon Grant
ADVERTISING AGENCIES:
Groupaction Marketing Inc.
President
Jean Brault
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Lafleur Communications
President
Jean Lafleur
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Groupe Everest (and its subsidiary, Media IDA Vision)
President
Claude Boulay
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Gosselin Communications Strategiques of Ottawa
President
Patrick Gosselin
Gilles-Andre Gosselin
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Communication Coffin
President
Paul Coffin
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Compass Communications
President
Tony Blom
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Palmer Jarvis
President
1993 - Present
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Vickers
President
1993 - Present
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Publicité Martin
President
1993 – Present
Chief Financial Officers
1993 – Present
Chief Government Relations Officials
1993 – Present
Dickson Lithographing
ADMINISTRATION:
Deputy Ministers, PWGSC:
Ron Quail, Deputy Minister, PWGSC (1993 – April 2001)
Janice Cochrane, Deputy Minister, PWGSC (April 2001 – June 2003); Appeared before PAC on March 1, 2004
David Marshall, Deputy Minister, PWGSC (June 2003 – Present); Appeared before PAC on Feb 24, 2004 and Feb 26, 2004
CCSB:
Chuck Guité, Director, Advertising and Research (1993 – Jan 1995); Director, Advertising and Public Opinion Research (APORS) (Jan 1995 – Nov 1997); Executive Director, Communications Coordination Services Branch (CCSB) (Nov 97 – Aug 99)
Pierre Tremblay, Executive Director, Communications Coordination Services Branch (CCSB) (Sept 99 – Sept 2001); Canadian Food Inspection Agency (Nov 2001 – Present)
Senior Officials from Canada Communications Group
Clerks of the Privy Council
Jocelyn Bourgeon
Mel Cappe
Alex Himelfarb
WHISTLEBLOWERS
MINISTERS INVOLVED:
PWGSC
Minister of Public Works:
Hon. David Charles Dingwall: 4 Nov. 1993 - 24 Jan. 1996
Hon. Diane Marleau: 25 Jan. 1996 - 11 July 1996
Minister of Public Works and Government Services:
Hon. Diane Marleau: 12 July 1996 - 10 June 1997
Hon. Alfonso Gagliano: 11 June 1997 - 14 Jan. 2002
Hon. Don Boudria: 15 Jan. 2002 - 25 May 2002
Hon. Ralph Goodale: 26 May 2002 -11 Dec. 2003
TBS
President of the Treasury Board:
Hon. Arthur C. Eggleton: 4 Nov. 1993 - 24 Jan. 1996
Hon. Marcel Massé: 25 Jan. 1996 - 2 Aug. 1999
Hon. Lucienne Robillard: 3 Aug. 1999 -11 Dec. 2003
INDUSTRY PROFESSIONALS:
Advertising Standards of Canada
OTHER SELECTED MINISTERS:
Hon. Anne McLellan, P.C., M.P.
Hon. David Anderson, P.C., M.P.
Hon. Andy Scott, P.C., M.P.
Hon. David Dingwall, P.C.
Hon. Denis Coderre, P.C., M.P.
GRANT RECIPIENTS:
EXPERTS ON MINISTERIAL ACCOUNTABILITY
Nick D’Ombrain
Jim Mitchell
Ercel Baker
Jack Manion
Donald Savoie
Patrick Boyer
Arthur Kroeger
Alan McEachan
John Stewart
John Roberts
David Zussman
Professor Ken Kernaghan
Professor Sandy Borins
OTHER WITNESSES:
Mario Lague
Bruce Hartley
Karl Littler
Terrie O’Leary
Warren Kinsella
Jean Carle
Pierre Lesieur
Albano Gidaro
Jean Marc Bard
Elly Alboim, Earnscliffe
Jacques Hudon, Groupaction
Senator David Smith
Raymond Garneau
Daniel Dezain
Stephen LeDrew
Senator Paul Massicotte
Buryl Wiseman
Giuseppe Morselli
Francoise Patry
Pierre Brodeur
Vincenzo Gagliano
Howard Wilson
Senator Wilfred Moore – Chairman of the Bluenose II Preservation Trust
Certified Fraud Examiner or Money Laundering Expert from the RCMP
Rt. Hon. Jean Chretien, P.C.
Rt. Hon. Paul Martin, P.C., M.P.